THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:55:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chapleau Health Services Chapleau
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
HOSPITAL: Chapleau Health Services
LOCATION: Chapleau

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmed Farrag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farrag (CPSO#: 104996 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chapleau Health Services Chapleau
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
HOSPITAL: Chapleau Health Services
LOCATION: Chapleau

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmed Farrag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farrag (CPSO#: 104996 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED MAHMOUD ALI FARRAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRAG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED MAHMOUD ALI FARRAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRAG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014