THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:49:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville Queen's FHO
Unit 103
145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chad Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stewart (CPSO#: 105011 )
Business Address: Belleville Queen's FHO
Unit 103
145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
(613) 771-1910

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville Queen's FHO
Unit 103
145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chad Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stewart (CPSO#: 105011 )
Business Address: Belleville Queen's FHO
Unit 103
145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
(613) 771-1910

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAD WALTER HOWARD STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAD WALTER HOWARD STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2014