THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:39:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053330116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olena Sedykh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Sedykh (CPSO#: 105025 )
Business Address: 1472 Huron St
London ON N5V 2E5
5196016640
Business Address: 2200 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4H9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053330116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olena Sedykh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Sedykh (CPSO#: 105025 )
Business Address: 1472 Huron St
London ON N5V 2E5
5196016640
Business Address: 2200 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4H9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLENA SEDYKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDYKH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLENA SEDYKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDYKH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2014