THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-2 Allaura Blvd
Aurora Ontario L4G 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 713-1717
Fax: (905) 751-0506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Okhravi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Okhravi (CPSO#: 105026 )
Business Address: 11-2 Allaura Blvd
Aurora ON L4G 3S5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: Shiraz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-2 Allaura Blvd
Aurora Ontario L4G 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 713-1717
Fax: (905) 751-0506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Okhravi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Okhravi (CPSO#: 105026 )
Business Address: 11-2 Allaura Blvd
Aurora ON L4G 3S5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POONEH OKHRAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKHRAVI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POONEH OKHRAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKHRAVI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Nov 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014