THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, NORWEGIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Barnstone Drive
Attending Physician Prince of Wales Retirement Home
Ottawa Ontario K2G 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138439887
Fax: 6138238511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Germany
Norway

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Oommen & F. Schwarz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Schwarz (CPSO#: 105032 ) Dr. R. Oommen (CPSO#: 117185 )
Business Address: 6558 Rideau Valley Dr N
Manotick ON K4M 1B3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, NORWEGIAN
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Barnstone Drive
Attending Physician Prince of Wales Retirement Home
Ottawa Ontario K2G 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138439887
Fax: 6138238511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Germany
Norway

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Oommen & F. Schwarz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Schwarz (CPSO#: 105032 ) Dr. R. Oommen (CPSO#: 117185 )
Business Address: 6558 Rideau Valley Dr N
Manotick ON K4M 1B3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIAN SCHWARZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIAN SCHWARZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2014