THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117-1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058429735
Fax: 9058429731
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Komaldeep Boyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Boyal (CPSO#: 105048 )
Business Address: 25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Suite 10
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
Business Address: Suite 14
10088 McLaughlin Road
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X4
Business Address: Unit 2
4000 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8Z2
Business Address: 115 - 1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
(613) 915-4163
Business Address: Suite 110-111
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
Business Address: 1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117-1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058429735
Fax: 9058429731
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Komaldeep Boyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Boyal (CPSO#: 105048 )
Business Address: 25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Suite 10
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
Business Address: Suite 14
10088 McLaughlin Road
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X4
Business Address: Unit 2
4000 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8Z2
Business Address: 115 - 1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
(613) 915-4163
Business Address: Suite 110-111
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
Business Address: 1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KOMALDEEP KAUR BOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KOMALDEEP KAUR BOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2014