THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:20:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1303 County Road 22
Suite 130
Belle River Ontario N8L 0J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 363-0930
Fax: (519) 968-3720

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Braedon Hendy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hendy (CPSO#: 105051 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Address: 130-1303 County Road 22
Belle River Ontario N0R 1A0
(226) 363-0930
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8N 1N9
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1303 County Road 22
Suite 130
Belle River Ontario N8L 0J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 363-0930
Fax: (519) 968-3720

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Braedon Hendy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hendy (CPSO#: 105051 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Address: 130-1303 County Road 22
Belle River Ontario N0R 1A0
(226) 363-0930
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8N 1N9
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRAEDON JAMES HENDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRAEDON JAMES HENDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2014