THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:56:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11666 Laity St
Ridge Meadows Hospital
Emergency Department
11666 Laity street
Maple Ridge BC V2X 5A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 463-4111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ontario Ministry of the Solicitor
Office of the Chief Coroner
119 King St W, 13th Flr
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4Y7
Phone: (905) 546-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22051 Fraser Hwy
Langley BC V3A 4H4
Phone: (604) 514-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 24 Centennial Drive
Seaforth Community Hospital
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
Phone: (519) 527-8404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sukhjiv Bajwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bajwa (CPSO#: 105056 )
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T8
(519) 426-0130
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11666 Laity St
Ridge Meadows Hospital
Emergency Department
11666 Laity street
Maple Ridge BC V2X 5A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 463-4111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ontario Ministry of the Solicitor
Office of the Chief Coroner
119 King St W, 13th Flr
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4Y7
Phone: (905) 546-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22051 Fraser Hwy
Langley BC V3A 4H4
Phone: (604) 514-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 24 Centennial Drive
Seaforth Community Hospital
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
Phone: (519) 527-8404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sukhjiv Bajwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bajwa (CPSO#: 105056 )
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T8
(519) 426-0130
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKHJIV SINGH BAJWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKHJIV SINGH BAJWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014