THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 01:25:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: New University of Lisboa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 81 Ainslie St south
Cambridge Ontario N1R3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 533-9777
Fax: (855) 408-0452

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Germano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Germano (CPSO#: 105063 )
Business Address: 81 Ainslie Street South
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3K6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: New University of Lisboa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 81 Ainslie St south
Cambridge Ontario N1R3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 533-9777
Fax: (855) 408-0452

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Germano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Germano (CPSO#: 105063 )
Business Address: 81 Ainslie Street South
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3K6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK FARIA GERMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERMANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK FARIA GERMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERMANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: New University of Lisboa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014