THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:04:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 1010
32 South Unionville Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-291-0033
Fax: 905-513-9538

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hang Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cheng (CPSO#: 105077 )
Business Address: 32 South Unionville Avenue
Unit 1010
Markham Ontario L3R 9S6
(416) 291-0033

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 1010
32 South Unionville Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-291-0033
Fax: 905-513-9538

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hang Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cheng (CPSO#: 105077 )
Business Address: 32 South Unionville Avenue
Unit 1010
Markham Ontario L3R 9S6
(416) 291-0033

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANG CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANG CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2014