THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:13:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-222 Fairview Dr
Brantford ON N3R 2W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-400-1760
Fax: 519-720-9997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tahir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tahir (CPSO#: 105659 ) Dr. A. Tahir (CPSO#: 105117 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-222 Fairview Dr
Brantford ON N3R 2W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-400-1760
Fax: 519-720-9997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tahir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tahir (CPSO#: 105659 ) Dr. A. Tahir (CPSO#: 105117 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD MUQUEET TAHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD MUQUEET TAHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2014