THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:45:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Court Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076247525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. F. Commisso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Commisso (CPSO#: 105118 )
Business Address: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
(807) 887-5252
Business Address: 17 Court Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 2W3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Court Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076247525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. F. Commisso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Commisso (CPSO#: 105118 )
Business Address: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
(807) 887-5252
Business Address: 17 Court Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 2W3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDIO FRANCESCO COMMISSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMMISSO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDIO FRANCESCO COMMISSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMMISSO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2014