THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:55:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dresden Community Healthcare Centre
P O Box 479
530 Tecumseh Street
Dresden Ontario N0P 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 683-4479
Fax: (519)683-2763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Briana Danielle Providence Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Providence (CPSO#: 105119 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
530 Tecumseh Street
Dresden Ontario N0P 1M0
(519) 683-4479

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dresden Community Healthcare Centre
P O Box 479
530 Tecumseh Street
Dresden Ontario N0P 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 683-4479
Fax: (519)683-2763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Briana Danielle Providence Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Providence (CPSO#: 105119 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
530 Tecumseh Street
Dresden Ontario N0P 1M0
(519) 683-4479

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Mar 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 24 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Briana Danielle Providence may practise medicine independently in
family medicine.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Briana Danielle Providence may practise medicine independently in
family medicine.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2014