THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:39:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sulaiman-Moy, Dina (Used Until: 31 Jan 2023)
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 67 College St, Suite 301, Toronto, ON
can be accessed by calling 416 901 0846.
Date Received: 23 Jun 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dina Sulaiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sulaiman (CPSO#: 105126 )
Business Address: 305-1223 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6E 1B5
(416) 519-7547
Business Address: 567 College Street
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M6G 3W9
(416) 901-0846

General Information

Former Name: Sulaiman-Moy, Dina (Used Until: 31 Jan 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 67 College St, Suite 301, Toronto, ON
can be accessed by calling 416 901 0846.
Date Received: 23 Jun 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dina Sulaiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sulaiman (CPSO#: 105126 )
Business Address: 305-1223 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6E 1B5
(416) 519-7547
Business Address: 567 College Street
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M6G 3W9
(416) 901-0846

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Mar 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 08 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dina Sulaiman-Moy may practise medicine independently in family medicine.




VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dina Sulaiman-Moy may practise medicine independently in family medicine.




Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2014