THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:03:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fujian Medical College, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Unionville Gate
Unit 200
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-846-0176
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xu Xia Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Chen (CPSO#: 105142 )
Business Address: 200-10 Unionville Gate
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
(647) 846-0176

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Fujian Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Unionville Gate
Unit 200
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-846-0176
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xu Xia Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Chen (CPSO#: 105142 )
Business Address: 200-10 Unionville Gate
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
(647) 846-0176

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XU XIA CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XU XIA CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fujian Medical College, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2014