THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:33:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Box 209 - Room D107
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 798 5555
Extension: 12906
Fax: 613 761 4186
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613)798-5555
Extension: 12906
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paraskevopoulos & Quon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Paraskevopoulos (CPSO#: 117608 ) Dr. M. Quon (CPSO#: 105189 )
Business Address: Queensway Carelton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
6137378899 Extn: 12906
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Room D103
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
6137985555 Extn: 12906
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Box 209 - Room D107
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 798 5555
Extension: 12906
Fax: 613 761 4186
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613)798-5555
Extension: 12906
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paraskevopoulos & Quon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Paraskevopoulos (CPSO#: 117608 ) Dr. M. Quon (CPSO#: 105189 )
Business Address: Queensway Carelton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
6137378899 Extn: 12906
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Room D103
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
6137985555 Extn: 12906
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH QUON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH QUON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2014