THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:51:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pape Medical Centre
751 Pape Avenue suite 215
Toronto Ontario M4K 3T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 347-3511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Fotis Karantonis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Karantonis (CPSO#: 105199 )
Business Address: Pape Medical Centre
Suite 215
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3T1
(647) 347-3511

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pape Medical Centre
751 Pape Avenue suite 215
Toronto Ontario M4K 3T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 347-3511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Fotis Karantonis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Karantonis (CPSO#: 105199 )
Business Address: Pape Medical Centre
Suite 215
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3T1
(647) 347-3511

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Jul 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 14 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Frank Fotis Karantonis may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Frank Fotis Karantonis may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 May 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 May 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2014