THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:01:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-847-1300
Fax: 905-487-1560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Foroozan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Foroozan (CPSO#: 105202 )
Business Address: Suite 500
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 847-1300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-847-1300
Fax: 905-487-1560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Foroozan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Foroozan (CPSO#: 105202 )
Business Address: Suite 500
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 847-1300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAJID FOROOZAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOROOZAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAJID FOROOZAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOROOZAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2014