THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:06:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mansoura University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network - General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 314-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOHAMED FAROUK SAAD IBRAHIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 105227 )
Business Address: 314-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
416-438-2911
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-6105

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Mansoura University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network - General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 314-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOHAMED FAROUK SAAD IBRAHIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 105227 )
Business Address: 314-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
416-438-2911
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-6105

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Nov 2022
31 Oct 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 01 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Oct 31 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMED FAROUK SAAD IBRAHIM may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. IBRAHIM holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. IBRAHIM no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. IBRAHIM’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. IBRAHIM’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 November, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 October, 2029.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMED FAROUK SAAD IBRAHIM may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. IBRAHIM holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. IBRAHIM no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. IBRAHIM’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. IBRAHIM’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 November, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 October, 2029.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mansoura University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2015