THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:24:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd-607 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-406-2800
Fax: 416-406-6760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek DeSa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Desa (CPSO#: 105230 )
Business Address: Beaches Family Practice & Walk-in
116 manor Drive
Toronto Ontario M4E 2X2
(416) 698-0999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd-607 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-406-2800
Fax: 416-406-6760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek DeSa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Desa (CPSO#: 105230 )
Business Address: Beaches Family Practice & Walk-in
116 manor Drive
Toronto Ontario M4E 2X2
(416) 698-0999

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Apr 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 07 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Derek Wayne Desa may practise medicine independently in family medicine.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Derek Wayne Desa may practise medicine independently in family medicine.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2014