THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-570-3377
Fax: 519-888-1079

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana E. Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Khalil (CPSO#: 105238 )
Business Address: 336 King Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 1G2
(519) 397-1721
Business Address: 200-564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
5195703377

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-570-3377
Fax: 519-888-1079

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana E. Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Khalil (CPSO#: 105238 )
Business Address: 336 King Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 1G2
(519) 397-1721
Business Address: 200-564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
5195703377

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA EMAD KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA EMAD KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2014