THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 888 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054192112
Fax: 7054192552
Address: Lower level
435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K6
Phone: (705) 675-2100
Fax: (705) 222-8119

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 29 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Al Mazrou'i Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al Mazrou'i (CPSO#: 105254 )
Business Address: 435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
7056752100 Extn: 1
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 888 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054192112
Fax: 7054192552
Address: Lower level
435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K6
Phone: (705) 675-2100
Fax: (705) 222-8119

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 29 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Al Mazrou'i Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al Mazrou'i (CPSO#: 105254 )
Business Address: 435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
7056752100 Extn: 1
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 27 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AHMED ABDULLAH KHAMIS AL MAZROU'I may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and gastroenterology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AHMED ABDULLAH KHAMIS AL MAZROU'I may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and gastroenterology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2014