THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-227 Algonquin Blvd W
Timmins ON P4N 2R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-360-5808
Fax: 705-264-2477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Lebel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lebel (CPSO#: 105271 )
Business Address: 140 Jubilee Avenue West
Timmins Ontario P4N 5W6
(705) 268-2666
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: 17 Cedar Street North
Timmins Ontario P4N 5L3
(705) 264-2174
Business Address: 201 - 330 2nd Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 8A4
(705) 267-8100
Business Address: 206 Fifth Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 5L3
(705) 264-6888
Business Address: 1-4715 Hwy 101 E
P.O. Box 3211
South Porcupine ON P0N 1H0
7052359600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-227 Algonquin Blvd W
Timmins ON P4N 2R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-360-5808
Fax: 705-264-2477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Lebel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lebel (CPSO#: 105271 )
Business Address: 140 Jubilee Avenue West
Timmins Ontario P4N 5W6
(705) 268-2666
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: 17 Cedar Street North
Timmins Ontario P4N 5L3
(705) 264-2174
Business Address: 201 - 330 2nd Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 8A4
(705) 267-8100
Business Address: 206 Fifth Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 5L3
(705) 264-6888
Business Address: 1-4715 Hwy 101 E
P.O. Box 3211
South Porcupine ON P0N 1H0
7052359600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD LEBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD LEBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Dec 2014