THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
190 Elizabeth St
8N-829
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4187
Extension: 4
Fax: (416) 340-4999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jauhal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jauhal (CPSO#: 105295 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
8N-829
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
416-340-4187 Extn: 5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
190 Elizabeth St
8N-829
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4187
Extension: 4
Fax: (416) 340-4999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jauhal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jauhal (CPSO#: 105295 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
8N-829
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
416-340-4187 Extn: 5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARENN SINGH JAUHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAUHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARENN SINGH JAUHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAUHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015