THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 06:28:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Surgery
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Clinician Investigator Program
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Clinician Investigator Program
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G Eamer medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Eamer (CPSO#: 105300 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Surgery
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Clinician Investigator Program
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Clinician Investigator Program
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G Eamer medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Eamer (CPSO#: 105300 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILGAMESH JAMES EAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EAMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILGAMESH JAMES EAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EAMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015