THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:25:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YUQI WANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wang (CPSO#: 105311 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YUQI WANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wang (CPSO#: 105311 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUQI WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUQI WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015