THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:30:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-10 Unionville Gate
Unionville ON L3R 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 475-3121
Fax: (905) 475-4270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Apr 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott McNaughton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McNaughton (CPSO#: 105314 )
Business Address: 3 - 5 Swan Lake Boulevard
Markham Ontario L6E 0K7
(905) 209-9977
Business Address: Pharmalinx Medical Centre
178 Main Street
Unionville Ontario L3R 2G9
(905) 475-9100
Business Address: 301-10 Unionville Gate
Unionville ON L3R 0W7
9054753121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-10 Unionville Gate
Unionville ON L3R 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 475-3121
Fax: (905) 475-4270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Apr 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott McNaughton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McNaughton (CPSO#: 105314 )
Business Address: 3 - 5 Swan Lake Boulevard
Markham Ontario L6E 0K7
(905) 209-9977
Business Address: Pharmalinx Medical Centre
178 Main Street
Unionville Ontario L3R 2G9
(905) 475-9100
Business Address: 301-10 Unionville Gate
Unionville ON L3R 0W7
9054753121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT MICHAEL MCNAUGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT MICHAEL MCNAUGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2015