THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:54:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Bayly Street West
Unit 504
Ajax Ontario L1S 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 251-5186
Fax: (905) 231-3358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Bayly Street West
Unit 504
Ajax Ontario L1S 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 251-5186
Fax: (905) 231-3358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIMITRY TERTEROV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERTEROV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIMITRY TERTEROV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERTEROV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 May 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2015