THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:25:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Perugia, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2348
Fax: (905) 577-8478
Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Thrombosis Clinic - Level B0
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 42640
Fax: (905) 574-7625

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 06 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davide Matino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Matino (CPSO#: 105317 )
Business Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Address: 1200-25 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Perugia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2348
Fax: (905) 577-8478
Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Thrombosis Clinic - Level B0
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 42640
Fax: (905) 574-7625

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 06 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davide Matino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Matino (CPSO#: 105317 )
Business Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Address: 1200-25 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Jun 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 18 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DAVIDE MATINO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Hematology and Thromboembolism, McMaster University, in which Dr. MATINO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. MATINO no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DAVIDE MATINO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Hematology and Thromboembolism, McMaster University, in which Dr. MATINO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. MATINO no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Perugia, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2015