THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:25:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Dept of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 12 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. MCPARTLIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. McPartlin (CPSO#: 105362 )
Business Address: 610 University Avenue
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Dept of Radiation Oncology
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Dept of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 12 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. MCPARTLIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. McPartlin (CPSO#: 105362 )
Business Address: 610 University Avenue
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Dept of Radiation Oncology
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 May 2022
11 May 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 12 2022
EXPIRY DATE: May 11 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ANDREW JAMES MCPARTLIN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiation Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MCPARTLIN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MCPARTLIN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MCPARTLIN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MCPARTLIN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 12 May, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 11 May, 2029.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ANDREW JAMES MCPARTLIN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiation Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MCPARTLIN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MCPARTLIN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MCPARTLIN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MCPARTLIN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 12 May, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 11 May, 2029.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 May 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 11 May 2029

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2015