THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:27:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 35148
Fax: 905-540-6583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Boudreau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Boudreau (CPSO#: 105365 )
Business Address: St. Joseph`s Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 0E3
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: St. Joseph`s Healthcare
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 35148
Fax: 905-540-6583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Boudreau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Boudreau (CPSO#: 105365 )
Business Address: St. Joseph`s Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 0E3
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: St. Joseph`s Healthcare
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANESSA BOUDREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDREAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANESSA BOUDREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDREAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015