THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:07:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17730 LESLIE ST., UNITE #101
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 835 0200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Brenda Boulevard
Pain Car Institute
Orangeville Ontario L9W 3Y5
Phone: 226-916-0911
Fax: 226-916-5617

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khorshidi and Dr. Ghazi-Mirsaeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khorshidi (CPSO#: 105375 ) Dr. S. Ghazi-Mirsaeed (CPSO#: 105464 )
Business Address: Units 2 & 3
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3C9
(905) 770-9096
Business Address: Unit 2
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
(905) 868-9243
Business Address: 17215 Leslie Street
York Ontario L3Y 8E4
(905) 853-0404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17730 LESLIE ST., UNITE #101
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 835 0200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Brenda Boulevard
Pain Car Institute
Orangeville Ontario L9W 3Y5
Phone: 226-916-0911
Fax: 226-916-5617

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khorshidi and Dr. Ghazi-Mirsaeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khorshidi (CPSO#: 105375 ) Dr. S. Ghazi-Mirsaeed (CPSO#: 105464 )
Business Address: Units 2 & 3
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3C9
(905) 770-9096
Business Address: Unit 2
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
(905) 868-9243
Business Address: 17215 Leslie Street
York Ontario L3Y 8E4
(905) 853-0404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIRMOHSEN KHORSHIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHORSHIDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIRMOHSEN KHORSHIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHORSHIDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015