THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: All Saints University of Medicine, Aruba, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Braydon Blvd
Brampton ON L6P 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-794-7649
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11755 Bramalea Road
Pulse Urgent Care Centre (Bramalea)
Brampton Ontario L6R 3S9
Phone: (289) 801-8999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 51 Mountainash Road
Brampton Urgent Care Centre
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: 9057992722
Fax: 4167501500
Address: 12560 Kennedy Road
Apex Urgent Care
Unit 2
Caledon Ontario L7C 4C4
Phone: 9054884899
Fax: +9054884895
Address: 25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
Toronto Ontario M9W 6N5
Phone: 4167412273
Fax: 4167501500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kashif Chahal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chahal (CPSO#: 105387 )
Business Address: Suite 8
51 Mountainash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Business Address: Suite 2
4000 Hwy 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8Z2
Business Address: Suite 4
11755 Bramalea Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 3S9
Business Address: Suite 1
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5Z6
Business Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
(416) 741-2273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: All Saints University of Medicine, Aruba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Braydon Blvd
Brampton ON L6P 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-794-7649
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11755 Bramalea Road
Pulse Urgent Care Centre (Bramalea)
Brampton Ontario L6R 3S9
Phone: (289) 801-8999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 51 Mountainash Road
Brampton Urgent Care Centre
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: 9057992722
Fax: 4167501500
Address: 12560 Kennedy Road
Apex Urgent Care
Unit 2
Caledon Ontario L7C 4C4
Phone: 9054884899
Fax: +9054884895
Address: 25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
Toronto Ontario M9W 6N5
Phone: 4167412273
Fax: 4167501500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kashif Chahal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chahal (CPSO#: 105387 )
Business Address: Suite 8
51 Mountainash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Business Address: Suite 2
4000 Hwy 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8Z2
Business Address: Suite 4
11755 Bramalea Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 3S9
Business Address: Suite 1
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5Z6
Business Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
(416) 741-2273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KASHIF ALI CHAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KASHIF ALI CHAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: All Saints University of Medicine, Aruba, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2015