THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:36:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-1648
Fax: (705) 444-1909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Smylie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Smylie (CPSO#: 105388 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-1648
Fax: (705) 444-1909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Smylie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Smylie (CPSO#: 105388 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER SMYLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYLIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER SMYLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYLIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2015