THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:27:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 124 Barker Street
London Ontario N5Y 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 204-2775
Fax: (519) 204-1856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.E. Ossai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ossai (CPSO#: 105391 )
Business Address: 124 Barker St
London ON N5Y 1Y1
5192042775

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 124 Barker Street
London Ontario N5Y 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 204-2775
Fax: (519) 204-1856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.E. Ossai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ossai (CPSO#: 105391 )
Business Address: 124 Barker St
London ON N5Y 1Y1
5192042775

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANKLIN EJIOFOR OSSAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSSAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANKLIN EJIOFOR OSSAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSSAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2015