THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:25:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tichreen, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thompson General Hospital
867 Thompson Drive South
Thompson Manitoba R8N 1Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (204) 778-1488
Fax: (204) 677-5339
Address: #205-1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: 9053040062
Fax: No Information Available
Address: #207- 10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6S0E2
Phone: 9057944497
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Internal Medicine
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: #4- 45 Hannover Dr
St. Catharines Ontario L2W1A3
Phone: 9056849999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: DAR AL SHIFA HOSPITAL
Beirut St.
KUWAIT Hawalli Kuwait P.O BOX 3390
Phone: 0096522231001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.RAMI ABOU-KHAMIS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abou-Khamis (CPSO#: 105422 )
Business Address: 2479 Elder Lane
Oakville ON L6M 0L1
204-891-5412

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tichreen, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thompson General Hospital
867 Thompson Drive South
Thompson Manitoba R8N 1Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (204) 778-1488
Fax: (204) 677-5339
Address: #205-1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: 9053040062
Fax: No Information Available
Address: #207- 10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6S0E2
Phone: 9057944497
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Internal Medicine
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: #4- 45 Hannover Dr
St. Catharines Ontario L2W1A3
Phone: 9056849999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: DAR AL SHIFA HOSPITAL
Beirut St.
KUWAIT Hawalli Kuwait P.O BOX 3390
Phone: 0096522231001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.RAMI ABOU-KHAMIS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abou-Khamis (CPSO#: 105422 )
Business Address: 2479 Elder Lane
Oakville ON L6M 0L1
204-891-5412

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMI ABOU-KHAMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOU-KHAMIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMI ABOU-KHAMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOU-KHAMIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tichreen, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2015