THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:42:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Swaich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Swaich (CPSO#: 105453 )
Business Address: 144 - 499 Main St S
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1N7
(905) 796-6570

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Swaich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Swaich (CPSO#: 105453 )
Business Address: 144 - 499 Main St S
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1N7
(905) 796-6570

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amanpreet Swaich may practise medicine independently in family medicine.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amanpreet Swaich may practise medicine independently in family medicine.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2015