THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dundas Centre medical
#206-220 Dundas street west
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-6685300
Fax: 905-668-5433
Address: i body
120 Duffield Dr, Markham,
Markham Ontario L6G 1C8
Phone: (905) 940-2639
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Varathalingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Varathalingam (CPSO#: 105461 )
Business Address: Dundas Centre Medical
404-220 Dundas Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
(905) 668-5300
Business Address: Oakdale Medical Centre
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 901-5119

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dundas Centre medical
#206-220 Dundas street west
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-6685300
Fax: 905-668-5433
Address: i body
120 Duffield Dr, Markham,
Markham Ontario L6G 1C8
Phone: (905) 940-2639
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Varathalingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Varathalingam (CPSO#: 105461 )
Business Address: Dundas Centre Medical
404-220 Dundas Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
(905) 668-5300
Business Address: Oakdale Medical Centre
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 901-5119

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THARSHA VARATHALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARATHALINGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THARSHA VARATHALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARATHALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2015