THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:17:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Suite 306
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727068
Fax: 9054727046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Babak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Babak (CPSO#: 105467 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
306-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-7072

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Suite 306
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727068
Fax: 9054727046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Babak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Babak (CPSO#: 105467 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
306-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-7072

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAM BABAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAM BABAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2015