THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 14:19:04 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-6 Telfer Glen St
Morriston Medical Centre
Morriston ON N0B 2C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-251-0422
Fax: 226-251-0423

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Feb 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manu Kaushik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kaushik (CPSO#: 105483 )
Business Address: Westminster Woods Medical Centre
Unit 1
33 Farley Drive
Guelph Ontario N1L 0B7
(519) 837-8137
Business Address: A-6 Telfer Glen St
Morriston ON N0B 2C0
226-251-0422

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-6 Telfer Glen St
Morriston Medical Centre
Morriston ON N0B 2C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-251-0422
Fax: 226-251-0423

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Feb 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manu Kaushik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kaushik (CPSO#: 105483 )
Business Address: Westminster Woods Medical Centre
Unit 1
33 Farley Drive
Guelph Ontario N1L 0B7
(519) 837-8137
Business Address: A-6 Telfer Glen St
Morriston ON N0B 2C0
226-251-0422

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Manu Kaushik may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Manu Kaushik may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2015