THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:02:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, TAMIL, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 77092
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Sep 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
McMaster Childrens Hospital, 1200 Main Street West, Hamilton, ON, L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasavi Raju Poolacherla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Poolacherla (CPSO#: 105504 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pyschiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, TAMIL, TELUGU
Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 77092
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Sep 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
McMaster Childrens Hospital, 1200 Main Street West, Hamilton, ON, L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasavi Raju Poolacherla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Poolacherla (CPSO#: 105504 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pyschiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Nov 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. VASAVI RAJU POOLACHERLA may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. VASAVI RAJU POOLACHERLA may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2015