THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:40:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suit 210
2224 Walker Rd
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 2559991
Fax: (519) 2557086

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Mar 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El Chami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. El Chami (CPSO#: 105521 )
Business Address: Suite 210
2224 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
(519) 255-9991

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suit 210
2224 Walker Rd
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 2559991
Fax: (519) 2557086

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Mar 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El Chami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. El Chami (CPSO#: 105521 )
Business Address: Suite 210
2224 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
(519) 255-9991

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Aug 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 12 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nisrine Abdel Salam El Chami may practise medicine independently in
paediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nisrine Abdel Salam El Chami may practise medicine independently in
paediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Beirut, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2015