THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:29:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexandra Marine and General
Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-8689
Extension: 5208
Fax: 5195248527

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Daters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Daters (CPSO#: 105573 )
Business Address: 120 Napier St
Goderich ON N7A 1W5
519-524-8323

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexandra Marine and General
Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-8689
Extension: 5208
Fax: 5195248527

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Daters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Daters (CPSO#: 105573 )
Business Address: 120 Napier St
Goderich ON N7A 1W5
519-524-8323

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON BRADLEY DATERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON BRADLEY DATERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2015