THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:59:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
A217
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4746
Fax: 416-480-5251

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTOPHER CHEUNG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cheung (CPSO#: 105574 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-4746

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
A217
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4746
Fax: 416-480-5251

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTOPHER CHEUNG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cheung (CPSO#: 105574 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-4746

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHING-HANG CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHING-HANG CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2015