THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:01:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Albany Medical College, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Upper Thornhill Medical Centre
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-9331
Fax: (905) 303-9337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maine
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Albany Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Upper Thornhill Medical Centre
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-9331
Fax: (905) 303-9337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maine
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLAMIDE SOLABOMI SOBOWALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBOWALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLAMIDE SOLABOMI SOBOWALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBOWALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Albany Medical College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2015