THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:16:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anaesthesiology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuqi Gu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Gu (CPSO#: 105600 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Department of Anesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
(613)737-8187

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anaesthesiology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuqi Gu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Gu (CPSO#: 105600 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Department of Anesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
(613)737-8187

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUQI GU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUQI GU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2015