THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:56:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Deparment of Pathology
F2-221
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 42040
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 International Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 International Boulevard
LifeLabs
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CJV Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campbell (CPSO#: 105646 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Deparment of Pathology
F2-221
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 42040
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 International Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 International Boulevard
LifeLabs
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CJV Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campbell (CPSO#: 105646 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLINTON JAMES VAUGHAN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLINTON JAMES VAUGHAN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2015