THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:22:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-523 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON M8Y 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473507546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hemsworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hemsworth (CPSO#: 105647 )
Business Address: 648 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M8Y 1K7
6473507546

Corporation Name: Hemsworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-523 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON M8Y 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473507546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hemsworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hemsworth (CPSO#: 105647 )
Business Address: 648 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M8Y 1K7
6473507546

Corporation Name: Hemsworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CODY CAMERON HEMSWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMSWORTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CODY CAMERON HEMSWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMSWORTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 28 Jun 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 28 Jun 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2015