THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:22:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 360
535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y5H2
Phone: 2893664565
Fax: 2893662065
Address: 8640 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 6Z4
Phone: 905-918-0119
Fax: 905-762-0883
Address: 7750 Bayview Ave
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Phone: 905-889-1125
Fax: 905-889-4216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Shouldice Hospital Ltd.
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rahul Bhayani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhayani (CPSO#: 105667 )
Business Address: 535 Mulock Drive
Suite 360
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
(289) 366-4565
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 7750 Bayview Ave
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 360
535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y5H2
Phone: 2893664565
Fax: 2893662065
Address: 8640 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 6Z4
Phone: 905-918-0119
Fax: 905-762-0883
Address: 7750 Bayview Ave
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Phone: 905-889-1125
Fax: 905-889-4216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Shouldice Hospital Ltd.
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rahul Bhayani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhayani (CPSO#: 105667 )
Business Address: 535 Mulock Drive
Suite 360
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
(289) 366-4565
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 7750 Bayview Ave
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHUL BHAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAYANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHUL BHAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAYANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2015