THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 401
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea, Ontario
Bramalea Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-792-2313
Fax: 905-792-7353
Address: Suite 401
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea, Ontario
L6T4S5
Bramalea Ontario L6T 4S5
Phone: 905-792-2313
Fax: 905-792-7353
Address: 30 Peel Centre Drive
Bramalea Retirement Residence
Brampton Ontario L6T 4G8
Phone: 9057907900
Fax: 905-792-3612
Address: 325 Fiddlers Green Road
Highgate Retirement Residence
Hamilton Ontario L9G 1W9
Phone: 647-648-8399
Fax: 905-648-5190
Address: 2233 Kipling Avenue
Kipling Acres LTC
Toronto Ontario M9W 4L3
Phone: 416-392-2300
Fax: 416-392-3360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Elahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Elahi (CPSO#: 105692 )
Business Address: 401-18 Kensington Road
Bramalea Ontario L6T 4S5
(905) 792-2313

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 401
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea, Ontario
Bramalea Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-792-2313
Fax: 905-792-7353
Address: Suite 401
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea, Ontario
L6T4S5
Bramalea Ontario L6T 4S5
Phone: 905-792-2313
Fax: 905-792-7353
Address: 30 Peel Centre Drive
Bramalea Retirement Residence
Brampton Ontario L6T 4G8
Phone: 9057907900
Fax: 905-792-3612
Address: 325 Fiddlers Green Road
Highgate Retirement Residence
Hamilton Ontario L9G 1W9
Phone: 647-648-8399
Fax: 905-648-5190
Address: 2233 Kipling Avenue
Kipling Acres LTC
Toronto Ontario M9W 4L3
Phone: 416-392-2300
Fax: 416-392-3360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Elahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Elahi (CPSO#: 105692 )
Business Address: 401-18 Kensington Road
Bramalea Ontario L6T 4S5
(905) 792-2313

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED OMAR H G ELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED OMAR H G ELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2015